OK SB2 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB2

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Coauthored by Senator Burns
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Student athletics; creating the Save Women's Sports Act; requiring certain athletic teams to be designated based on biological sex. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student athletics; creating the Save Women's Sports Act; requiring certain athletic teams to be designated based on biological sex. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-18 - House - House: State and Federal Redistricting Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Burns
2021-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2021-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2021-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2021-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Weaver
2021-05-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Taylor
2021-04-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Merrick
2021-04-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-04-20SenateHAs read
2021-04-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-19HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18
2021-04-19HouseAyes: 60 Nays: 18
2021-04-19HouseAmended
2021-04-19HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Murdock, Dahm, Hamilton, Quinn, Stephens, Rogers, Bullard
2021-04-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, West (Josh), Humphrey, Conley, Stark, Russ, Boles, Townley, Gann, Kendrix, Lawson, McDugle, Roberts (Sean), Manger, Lowe (Dick), Steagall, Roe, Hardin (David), Grego, Dempsey, Smith, West (Rick), Sneed, Cornwell, Wolfley, Bashore, Olsen, Miller, Stearman, Baker
2021-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dills
2021-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2021-04-07HouseWithdrawn from Common Education Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2021-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-01SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
2021-03-01SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-23SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB2 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Finance

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb2&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB2%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB2%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB2%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB2%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB2%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB2%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FA1%20DILLSSH-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FA2%20VIRGINEM-LRB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FA3%20BLANCETTME-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FA4%20BLANCETTME-LRB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FA5%20NICHOLSMO-AMM.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB2%20FULLPCS1%20TONI%20HASENBECK-EK.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FA3%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FA4%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FA5%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB2%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB2%20HASB%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB2%20INT%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB2_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB2_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback