OK SB2 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; removing requirement to administer assessments in U.S. history. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; removing requirement to administer assessments in U.S. history. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-20SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-15SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7
2017-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 10
2017-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-02-20Senatecoauthored by Nollan
2017-02-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Henke (principal House author)
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Dossett
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210508New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback