OK SB1975 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

An Act relating to appropriations; making appropriations. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act relating to appropriations; making appropriations. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-05-24 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 30 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 47 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-29 Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-24 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-24 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-24 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 42
2012-05-24 Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40
2012-05-24 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears
2012-05-24 Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 47
2012-05-24 Ayes: 47 Nays: 46
2012-05-24 JCR adopted
2012-05-24 General Order
2012-05-23 Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2012-05-22 First Reading
2012-05-22 Engrossed to House
2012-05-22 Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15
2012-05-22 JCR adopted
2012-05-21 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2012-05-09 Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2012-05-08 coauthored by Martin (Scott)
2012-05-08 coauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2012-05-08 coauthored by Justice
2012-05-08 Authored by Senator Jolley
2012-05-08 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback