OK SB1965 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal investigations; modifying procedures. Effective date.
Title
Criminal investigations; modifying procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Motion expired | |
2010-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Russell | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | |
2010-03-10 | Remove as author Senator Coates; authored by Senator Russell | |
2010-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Pending removal author Senator Coates and replace with Senator Russell | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Hilliard (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-15 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 3011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 850 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 24A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 150 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |