OK SB195 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Memorial bridge designations; designating various memorial bridges and highways. Codification. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial bridge designations; designating various memorial bridges and highways. Codification. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 CCR submitted
2011-05-17 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2011-05-17 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2011-05-16 CCR read
2011-05-10 SCs named Paddack, Stanislawski, Branan, David, Allen, Burrage
2011-05-09 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation
2011-05-04 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-26 HAs read
2011-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
2011-04-25 Amended
2011-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Lockhart, Walker, Thomsen, Stiles
2011-04-25 General Order
2011-03-30 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Transportation
2011-03-08 First Reading
2011-03-08 Engrossed to House
2011-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-07 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-03-07 General Order, Considered
2011-02-24 coauthored by Billy (principal House author)
2011-02-24 Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Transportation
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Paddack
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
691698100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169894Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169898Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69169899Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback