OK SB194 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB194
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher candidates; removing requirement for certain candidates to pass certain reading assessment. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teacher candidates; removing requirement for certain candidates to pass certain reading assessment. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB194 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019