OK SB1913 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Tourism and recreation; Oklahoma State Park Trust Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Tourism and recreation; Oklahoma State Park Trust Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF CHAIR (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE ADVANCEMENT (Y: 59 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF CHAIR (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE ADVANCEMENT (Y: 59 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-23 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Motion expired | |
2012-04-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 | |
2012-04-18 | Considered | |
2012-04-12 | Laid over | |
2012-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Pittman | |
2012-04-12 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Hardin | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Emergency added | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Simpson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |