OK SB1902 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; regulating the provision of RU-486. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; regulating the provision of RU-486. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Approved by Governor 04/02/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-03-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby, Faught, Wesselhoft, Kern, Wright (John), Billy, Tibbs | |
2010-03-29 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Marlatt | |
2010-03-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | |
2010-03-10 | coauthored by Lamb | |
2010-03-10 | Remove as author Senator Lamb; authored by Senator Jolley | |
2010-03-10 | Remove as coauthor Senator Jolley | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-26 | Pending removal author Senator Lamb and replace with Senator Jolley | |
2010-02-26 | Pending coauthor removal (Senator Jolley) | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Reynolds | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Jolley | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) McNiel | |
2010-02-08 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Reynolds | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 729 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 729a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |