OK SB1891 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Occupations and professions; creating the Universal Occupational Licensing Recognition Act. Effective date.
Title
Occupations and professions; creating the Universal Occupational Licensing Recognition Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-15 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Roe, Fugate |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |