OK SB1879 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Hospices; requiring a hospice program be managed by certified administrators; Health Department to issue certifications to qualified persons. Effective date.
Title
Hospices; requiring a hospice program be managed by certified administrators; Health Department to issue certifications to qualified persons. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 860 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |