OK SB1866 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Alarm and Locksmith Industry Act; transfer; records and personnel; duties and responsibilities. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alarm and Locksmith Industry Act; transfer; records and personnel; duties and responsibilities. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-22 Sent to Governor
2012-05-22 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-22 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-21 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-21 Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-05-21 HAs adopted
2012-04-12 HAs read
2012-04-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-11 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-11 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2012-04-11 General Order
2012-04-05 Title restored
2012-04-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
2012-03-13 General Order, Considered
2012-03-01 Title stricken
2012-03-01 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-21 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-21 coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author)
2012-02-21 Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2012-02-08 Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Newberry
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5918001New CodeSee Bill Text
59180010New CodeSee Bill Text
59180011New CodeSee Bill Text
59180012New CodeSee Bill Text
59180013New CodeSee Bill Text
59180014New CodeSee Bill Text
59180015New CodeSee Bill Text
59180016New CodeSee Bill Text
59180017New CodeSee Bill Text
5918002New CodeSee Bill Text
5918003New CodeSee Bill Text
5918003aNew CodeSee Bill Text
5918004New CodeSee Bill Text
5918005New CodeSee Bill Text
5918006New CodeSee Bill Text
5918007New CodeSee Bill Text
5918008New CodeSee Bill Text
5918009New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback