OK SB1863 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local Development Act; expands areas where a county is authorized to create certain districts. Effective date.
Title
Local Development Act; expands areas where a county is authorized to create certain districts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stewart |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |