OK SB186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; recreating certain entities; modifying termination dates; terminating Minority Teacher Recruitment Advisory Committee.
Title
Sunset; recreating certain entities; modifying termination dates; terminating Minority Teacher Recruitment Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Vetoed 04/21/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | Veto message read | |
2011-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5 | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-21 | coauthored by Faught (principal House author) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |