OK SB1859 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; broadening certain definition to include certain acts; modifying the Heartbeat Informed Consent Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; broadening certain definition to include certain acts; modifying the Heartbeat Informed Consent Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2020-03-16HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-16SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
2020-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author)
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator McCortney
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2020-02-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Scott
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback