OK SB185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Food; creating the Mobile Food Vendor Act; requiring certain licensing and inspections. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Food; creating the Mobile Food Vendor Act; requiring certain licensing and inspections. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Emergency added |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2023-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)