OK SB185 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB185
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2017-05-11 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Babinec and substitute with Representative Loring |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Floyd, Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Matthews |
2017-05-02 | Senate | coauthored by Goodwin |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 14 |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-05 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 332 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |