OK SB185 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Building Construction and Planning Act; authorizing use of Best Value Competitive Proposals. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Public Building Construction and Planning Act; authorizing use of Best Value Competitive Proposals. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Liebmann (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |