OK SB1849 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; placing monetary limit for cooperative purchasing agreements by school districts. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; placing monetary limit for cooperative purchasing agreements by school districts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |