OK SB1847 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - SCs named Jolley, Justice, Nichols, Simpson, Burrage, Ballenger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - SCs named Jolley, Justice, Nichols, Simpson, Burrage, Ballenger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Public Safety; requiring the Department to conduct a certain study. Effective date.
Title
Department of Public Safety; requiring the Department to conduct a certain study. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | SCs named Jolley, Justice, Nichols, Simpson, Burrage, Ballenger | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2012-05-17 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-16 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-15 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-18 | HAs read | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2012-04-17 | General Order | |
2012-04-11 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |