OK SB1840 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; creating Organ Donor Education and Awareness Advisory Council. Effective date.
Title
Public health; creating Organ Donor Education and Awareness Advisory Council. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Kouplen (principal House author) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1135 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 103a | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2220 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2220 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2220 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2220 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |