OK SB1835 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed behavioral practitioners; modifying certifying entity. Emergency.
Title
Licensed behavioral practitioners; modifying certifying entity. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/18/2020 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-11 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |