OK SB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; requiring establishment of mandatory training program for certain employees as financial managers. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; requiring establishment of mandatory training program for certain employees as financial managers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB179 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee