OK SB175 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public Health and Safety; 9-1-1 system; submission of certain report by certain date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health and Safety; 9-1-1 system; submission of certain report by certain date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-20 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-20 To Senate
2011-05-20 Motion expired
2011-05-20 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jackson
2011-05-20 Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 27
2011-05-20 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds
2011-05-20 Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2011-05-20 CCR adopted
2011-05-18 CCR submitted
2011-05-18 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 coauthored by Simpson
2011-05-18 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 Emergency added
2011-05-17 CCR read
2011-04-27 Conference granted, naming: GCCA
2011-04-27 SCs named Anderson, Barrington, Coates, Fields, Wilson, Ellis
2011-04-25 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-20 HAs read
2011-04-20 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-19 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-19 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 36
2011-04-19 General Order
2011-04-07 Enacting clause stricken
2011-04-07 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2011-03-09 First Reading
2011-03-09 Engrossed to House
2011-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-08 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2011-03-08 General Order, Considered
2011-03-01 coauthored by Jackson (principal House author)
2011-03-01 coauthored by Barrington
2011-03-01 Title stricken
2011-03-01 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-02-22 Referred to Public Safety
2011-02-22 Withdrawn from Rules committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Anderson
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6328431New CodeSee Bill Text
632844New CodeSee Bill Text
632846New CodeSee Bill Text
74511New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback