OK SB1728 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; creating the Unborn Person Wrongful Death Act; modifying requirements for award of certain damages; modifying persons with standing to bring certain actions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; creating the Unborn Person Wrongful Death Act; modifying requirements for award of certain damages; modifying persons with standing to bring certain actions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
2020-05-15HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Shaw
2020-05-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Stark, Steagall, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Smith, Grego, Patzkowsky, Roberts (Sean), Taylor
2020-05-15HouseGeneral Order
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Public Health, Direct to Calendar
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2020-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2020-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Howard
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2020-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2020-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2020-02-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-03Senatecoauthored by Olsen
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bullard
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback