OK SB1728 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Human Rights Commission; Employment-based discrimination. File complaint with Attorney General. Emergency.
Title
Human Rights Commission; Employment-based discrimination. File complaint with Attorney General. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-23 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Title restored | |
2012-05-22 | CCR read | |
2012-05-15 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-14 | SCs named Newberry, Johnson (Rob), Jolley, Nichols, Sparks, Ivester | |
2012-05-09 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 12 | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-08 | coauthored by Eason McIntyre | |
2012-03-08 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 13 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 14 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1505 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 163 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |