OK SB1723 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Entrepreneurship Network. Effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Entrepreneurship Network. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | |
2010-03-08 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Gumm | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 5003 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |