OK SB170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating special license plates. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating special license plates. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateApproved by Governor 05/23/2019
2019-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-15HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-15SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-15SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-14SenateEmergency added
2019-05-14SenateCCR read
2019-05-13Senatecoauthored by Davis
2019-05-06Senatecoauthored by Conley
2019-05-02SenateSCs named Standridge, Bergstrom, Daniels, Sharp, Brooks, Young
2019-05-02Senatecoauthored by Goodwin
2019-05-01HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-15HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2019-04-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
2019-04-15HouseRemove Representative Fugate as principal House author and substitute with Representative Frix
2019-04-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Fugate (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb170&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB170%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB170%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB170%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB170%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB170%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB170%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB170%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB170%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB170_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB170_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback