OK SB1694 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Administrative Procedures Act; modifying actions with respect to which higher education institution required to comply. Effective date.
Title
Administrative Procedures Act; modifying actions with respect to which higher education institution required to comply. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House: Higher Education and CareerTech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/09/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-03 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and CareerTech Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and CareerTech |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |