OK SB1690 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Special license plates; creating the Veterans of the United States Armed Forces License Plate. Effective date.
Title
Special license plates; creating the Veterans of the United States Armed Forces License Plate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |