OK SB1682 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed lenders; proscribing certain activities by certain entities; prohibiting certain actions for certain lenders; providing for certain actions for certain violations. Effective date.
Title
Licensed lenders; proscribing certain activities by certain entities; prohibiting certain actions for certain lenders; providing for certain actions for certain violations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 13 |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |