OK SB1674 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; creating felony offense; providing for certain sentence. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; creating felony offense; providing for certain sentence. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
2020-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback