OK SB1668 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Vetoed 05/24/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Vetoed 05/24/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; repealing prohibition against nuclear power generation facilities. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; repealing prohibition against nuclear power generation facilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Vetoed 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-13 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Branan | |
2010-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 | |
2010-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 20 | |
2010-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Title restored | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-08 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-08 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Duncan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 24 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |