OK SB1663 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.
Title
State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |