OK SB165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor advertising; relating to definitions for signs; standards; modifying minimum distance between certain signs. Effective date.
Title
Outdoor advertising; relating to definitions for signs; standards; modifying minimum distance between certain signs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 17 |
2015-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered and deferred |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Loveless, Stanislawski, Marlatt, Silk, Barrington, Wyrick, Bass |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 15 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-04-06 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Joyner (principal House author) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Loveless |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |