OK SB1643 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishment; creating the Modernized Operations through Data and Evidence-based Restoration Now (MODERN) Justice Task Force. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishment; creating the Modernized Operations through Data and Evidence-based Restoration Now (MODERN) Justice Task Force. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Howard [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |