OK SB1621 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; exempting certain health benefits plans from the provisions of the Small Employer Health Insurance Reform Act. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; exempting certain health benefits plans from the provisions of the Small Employer Health Insurance Reform Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 19 | |
2012-04-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | |
2012-04-18 | General Order | |
2012-04-16 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |