OK SB1619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax; exempting trade-in value from purchase price of vehicle for calculation of tax due. Effective date.
Title
Sales and use tax; exempting trade-in value from purchase price of vehicle for calculation of tax due. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |