OK SB1617 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Insurance; modifying provisions relating to the Unauthorized Insurers and Surplus Lines Insurance Act. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; modifying provisions relating to the Unauthorized Insurers and Surplus Lines Insurance Act. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 4 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 7
2012-05-25 Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2012-05-25 Motion to reconsider tabled
2012-05-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 7
2012-05-25 Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-17 CCR submitted
2012-05-17 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-05-17 CCR adopted
2012-05-16 Title restored
2012-05-16 CCR read
2012-05-01 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development
2012-05-01 SCs named Brown, Stanislawski, Treat, Brecheen, Bass, Sparks
2012-04-30 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-19 HAs read
2012-04-19 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-18 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-18 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4
2012-04-18 General Order
2012-04-16 Title stricken
2012-04-16 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Insurance
2012-03-07 First Reading
2012-03-07 Engrossed to House
2012-03-06 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-06 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2012-03-06 General Order, Considered
2012-02-28 coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Brown
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3611001New CodeSee Bill Text
3611002New CodeSee Bill Text
3611011New CodeSee Bill Text
3611061New CodeSee Bill Text
36647019New CodeSee Bill Text
3664703New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback