OK SB1616 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Controlled Insurance Programs Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Controlled Insurance Programs Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 CCR submitted
2012-05-25 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-23 CCR read
2012-05-07 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development
2012-05-07 SCs named Coates, Brown, Burrage, Anderson, Ballenger, Barrington
2012-05-01 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-23 HAs read
2012-04-23 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-19 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-19 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
2012-04-19 Title restored
2012-04-19 Amended
2012-04-19 General Order
2012-04-16 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Insurance
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2012-03-13 Title stricken
2012-03-13 General Order, Amended
2012-02-28 coauthored by Quinn (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Coates
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback