OK SB1606 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax adjustments; requiring certain amounts deducted on federal return be added to Oklahoma income under specified conditions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax adjustments; requiring certain amounts deducted on federal return be added to Oklahoma income under specified conditions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 57 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24SenateApproved by Governor 05/24/2016
2016-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 42
2016-05-19HouseMotion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 32
2016-05-19HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCullough
2016-05-19HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 50
2016-05-19HouseJCR adopted
2016-05-19HouseGeneral Order
2016-05-17HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2016-05-16HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-16SenateEngrossed to House
2016-05-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-05-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2016-05-16SenateJCR adopted
2016-05-12SenateReported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2016-05-12SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-12Senatecoauthored by Mazzei
2016-05-11Senatecoauthored by Casey
2016-05-11Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2016-05-11Senatecoauthored by Treat
2016-05-11SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2016-05-11SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback