OK SB16 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; Relating to membership; modifying certain schedule requirement. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; Relating to membership; modifying certain schedule requirement. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 |
2016-04-11 | House | General Order |
2016-03-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 105 | 2A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1085 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |