OK SB1589 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Transportation, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Transportation, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; modifying qualifying persons for extensions. Effective date.
Title
Driver licenses; modifying qualifying persons for extensions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |