OK SB1588 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oklahoma Firefighters, Police and Law Enforcement Pension and Retirement Systems; making technical corrections to bring laws into compliance with IRS laws and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Firefighters, Police and Law Enforcement Pension and Retirement Systems; making technical corrections to bring laws into compliance with IRS laws and regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Motion expired
2012-05-23 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Armes
2012-05-23 Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0; Ayes: 66 Nays: 22
2012-05-23 CCR adopted
2012-05-17 CCR submitted
2012-05-17 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2012-05-17 CCR adopted
2012-05-16 Title restored
2012-05-16 CCR read
2012-05-02 SCs named Barrington, Brown, Anderson, Childers, Ballenger, Garrison
2012-05-01 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development
2012-04-23 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-10 HAs read
2012-04-10 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-09 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-09 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2012-04-09 Amended
2012-04-09 General Order
2012-04-03 Title stricken
2012-04-03 Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
2012-04-03 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services
2012-03-07 First Reading
2012-03-07 Engrossed to House
2012-03-06 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-06 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-03-06 Title restored
2012-03-06 General Order, Amended
2012-03-06 Senate Rule suspended
2012-02-28 coauthored by Armes (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Title stricken
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Barrington
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1149100New CodeSee Bill Text
1149101New CodeSee Bill Text
1149106New CodeSee Bill Text
1149111New CodeSee Bill Text
1149122New CodeSee Bill Text
1149143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1150114New CodeSee Bill Text
472305New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback