OK SB1585 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - CCR submitted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - CCR submitted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Financing school construction; creating the Qualified School Construction Bonds Act. Emergency.
Title
Financing school construction; creating the Qualified School Construction Bonds Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-28 | Title restored | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | Withdrawn from GCCA; HC's named: Denney, Coody, Sears, Shumate, Cannaday | |
2010-04-15 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-13 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-12 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-07 | HAs read | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 40; Ayes: 54 Nays: 32 | |
2010-04-06 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Amended | |
2010-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Martin (Scott) | |
2010-04-06 | General Order | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-09 | coauthored by Miller (principal House author) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 15 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 15 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 15 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 163 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 343 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |