OK SB1584 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways and bridges; designating the Sgt. Meagan Burke Memorial Bridge. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highways and bridges; designating the Sgt. Meagan Burke Memorial Bridge. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |