OK SB1577 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Vetoed 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Vetoed 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Open records; providing exception for certain business information kept by higher education institutions. Effective date.
Title
Open records; providing exception for certain business information kept by higher education institutions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House: Higher Education and CareerTech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Vetoed 04/16/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Veto message read |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 5 |
2014-04-10 | House | General Order |
2014-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and CareerTech Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and CareerTech |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Bass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Quinn (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Burrage |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |