OK SB1561 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from County and Municipal Government, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from County and Municipal Government, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act; providing exemption for the Oklahoma Municipal Power Authority. Emergency.
Title
Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act; providing exemption for the Oklahoma Municipal Power Authority. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from County and Municipal Government, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |