OK SB1533 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oklahoma State Athletic Commission Act; legislative intent. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma State Athletic Commission Act; legislative intent. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-24 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-24 To Senate
2012-05-24 Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 1
2012-05-24 CCR adopted
2012-05-22 CCR submitted
2012-05-22 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-22 CCR adopted, GCCA
2012-05-18 Emergency removed
2012-05-18 Enacting clause restored
2012-05-18 Title restored
2012-05-18 CCR read, GCCA
2012-05-07 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2012-05-03 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-02 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-16 HAs read
2012-04-16 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-12 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6
2012-04-12 Considered
2012-04-11 Laid over
2012-04-11 Placed on Third Reading
2012-04-11 Amended
2012-04-11 House Rule suspended
2012-04-11 General Order
2012-04-05 Enacting clause stricken
2012-04-05 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
2012-03-13 Remove as coauthor Senator Ivester
2012-03-13 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Ivester
2012-02-27 coauthored by Newell (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Emergency added
2012-02-27 Title stricken
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-16 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-16 Withdrawn from Rules committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Jolley
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback