OK SB1521 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial bridges; creating various memorial highway and bridge designations. Effective date.
Title
Memorial bridges; creating various memorial highway and bridge designations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Standridge |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |