OK SB15 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teachers; providing for development and implementation of teacher recruitment programs. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; providing for development and implementation of teacher recruitment programs. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateApproved by Governor 05/01/2017
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2017-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-19HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-10HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
2017-03-22SenateEmergency clause restored
2017-03-22SenateTitle restored
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2017-02-15SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
706131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
706132Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback